VA HB1109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; time of certain local elections. Removes a provision that requires local elections for mayor, members of a local governing body, or members of an elected school board to be held at the time of the November general election. The bill allows cities and towns that made the transition between July 1, 2021, and July 1, 2022, to provide by ordinance for its reversal.
Title
Elections; time of certain local elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102513D |