VA HB111 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
National Guard protections; employment. Extends the rights regarding (i) leaves of absence from nongovernmental employment, (ii) reemployment, and (iii) employment nondiscrimination that are currently provided to members of the Virginia National Guard and the Virginia Defense Force to Virginia residents who are members of the National Guard of another state.
Title
Virginia National Guard; extends reemployment & nondiscrimination rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB111ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB111H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104687D-H1 |
2016-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-05 | House | Incorporates HB921 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104687D-H1 |
2016-02-05 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #3 |
2015-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2015-12-15 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101576D |
Same As/Similar To
HB921 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Incorporated by Militia, Police and Public Safety