VA HB1116 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Political parties; notification of adoption of primary election; certification of candidates. Directs the state political party chairmen, or their designees, to notify the Department of Elections of the party's adoption of a primary election for any office. The bill also directs state political party chairmen, or their designees, to certify to the Department of Elections the names of any candidate who has been nominated by the party through a nomination method other than a primary. Currently, these notification and certification responsibilities are shared by the state, district, and political subdivision party committee chairmen for their respective offices. The bill also provides that if a state party chairman, or his designee, fails to certify the name of a candidate for an office, the Department of Elections shall declare that there is no candidate nominated by the party for that office. The bill contains technical amendments that reflect the current administrative responsibilities of the Department of Elections.
Title
Political parties; notification of adoption of primary election, certification of candidates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N) (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 20109458D-S1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Chair rules floor substitute by Senator Surovell is germane |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20109458D-S1 (Surovell) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102715D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 517 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 527 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |