VA HB1119 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Exhaust system in good working order. Requires that vehicles be equipped with an adequate exhaust system, defined to include a catalytic converter and muffler or mufflers. The bill removes the requirement that such system be of a type installed as standard factory equipment or comparable to that designed as standard factory equipment and not permit noise louder than standard factory equipment.
Title
Motor vehicles; exhaust system in good working order.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103870D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1119 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1119+hil |