VA HB1128 | 2022 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1128
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-4)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; military benefits subtraction. Establishes an income tax subtraction for up to $10,000 of military benefits in taxable year 2022, up to $20,000 of military benefits in taxable year 2023, up to $30,000 in taxable year 2024, and up to $40,000 in taxable year 2025 and each taxable year thereafter. The bill defines military benefits to include military retirement income for recipients who are age 55 or older and benefits paid to the surviving spouse of a veteran.
Title
Income tax, state; military benefits subtraction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-17 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected #2 (0-Y 97-N 2-A) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N 2-A) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 6-N 2-A) (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected #2 (0-Y 97-N 2-A) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N 2-A) (Y: 1 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: of adjournment of the 2022 Special Session l) | |
2022-08-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective on the 1st day of the 4th month following the month | |
2022-07-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., August 4, 2022 | |
2022-07-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on July 28, 2022 |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-07-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-07-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1128ER) |
2022-07-20 | House | Enrolled |
2022-06-17 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-06-01 | House | VOTE: Adoption (86-Y 6-N 2-A) |
2022-06-01 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (86-Y 6-N 2-A) |
2022-03-12 | House | Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 22107554D-H1 |
2022-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Locke, Deeds |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Delegates: McGuire, Orrock, Torian |
2022-03-02 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2022-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Rejected #2 (0-Y 97-N 2-A) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107275D-S1 (0-Y 97-N 2-A) |
2022-03-02 | House | Reconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House |
2022-03-02 | House | VOTE: Rejected (1-Y 96-N 2-A) |
2022-03-02 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 22107275D-S1 (1-Y 96-N 2-A) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1128S1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107275D-S1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107275D-S1 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22104276D-E |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1128E |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 22104276D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1128 (Carry Over) 2022-03-12 - Continued to 2022 Sp. Sess. 1 pursuant to HJR455
SB528 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
SB528 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
SB528 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)
SB528 (Same As) 2022-08-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0015)