VA HB1151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act. Adds autocycles to the vehicles protected by the Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act, commonly known as the "lemon law." The bill contains technical amendments. Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act. Adds autocycles to the vehicles protected by the Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act, commonly known as the "lemon law." The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Motor Vehicle Warranty Enforcement Act; adds autocycles to the vehicles protected by Act.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0411) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 411 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1151ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-11 | House | Printed as engrossed 22103657D-E |
2022-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1151E |
2022-02-11 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2022-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22103657D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 207.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |