VA HB1167 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Summary
Administrative Process Act (APA); public participation guidelines. Requires, on or before July 1, 2008, the Department of Planning and Budget, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to (i) develop model public participation guidelines and (ii) provide these model public participation guidelines to each agency that has the authority to promulgate regulations. By December 1, 2008, each agency shall either (a) adopt the model public participation guidelines or (b) if significant additions or changes are proposed, promulgate the model public participation guidelines with the proposed changes as fast-track regulations pursuant to § 2.2-4012.1. Agency action in adopting the model public participation guidelines in accordance with clause (a) shall be exempt from the APA. Any regulatory action commenced on or after January 1, 2009, shall use the model public participation guidelines in the form adopted by an agency. Thereafter, any amendments to an agency's public participation guidelines must be done in accordance with the APA. This bill is identical to
Title
Administrative Process Act; public participation guidelines for executive branch agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 321 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1167ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081792806 |
Same As/Similar To
SB734 (Same As) 2010-02-15 - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1167 |