VA HB1187 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; parking charges by providers of accommodations to transients. Exempts from sales and use tax separately stated parking charges by hotels and other similar providers of accommodations to transients.
Title
Sales and Use Tax; exempts parking charges by providers of accommodations to transients.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16103616D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1187 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1187+hil |