VA HB1206 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Summary
VPA police. Allows a Virginia Port Authority (VPA) police officer to provide enhanced supply chain security beyond the locality where VPA property is located. This bill is identical to
Title
Port Authority; police officer to provide security beyond locality where property is located.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 324 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1206ER) | |
2008-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2008-01-29 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-01-23 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-23 | House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081166828 |
Same As/Similar To
SB465 (Same As) 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0374)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1206 |