VA HB1218 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Summary
Wireless telecommunications devices. Prohibits use of wireless telecommunications devices by persons operating school buses, except in emergencies, or when the vehicle is lawfully parked and for the purposes of dispatching. Use of two-way radio devices authorized by the school bus owner, however, is permitted. This bill is identical to
Title
School buses; prohibits use of wireless telecommunications devices by persons driving.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447) | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-28 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-28 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1218ER) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-11 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2008-02-11 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1218H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083547436-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute printed 083547436-H1 | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-30 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 2 | |
2008-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084595436 |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Same As) 2010-02-04 - Senate: Stricken at request of Patron in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1218 |