VA HB1218 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stream mitigation banks. Combines the Tennessee River Basin and the Big Sandy River Basin into one river watershed for the purpose of establishing and operating a stream mitigation bank within the watershed.
Title
Stream mitigation banks; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631) | |
2012-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1218ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-08 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake | |
2012-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-19 | House: Presented and ordered printed 12104064D |