VA HB1224 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Motor Vehicles; fees. Reduces the fee for the issuance of an original, duplicate, reissue, or renewal special identification card without a photograph from $10 per year with a $20 minimum fee to $2 per year with a $10 minimum fee.
Title
Special identification cards; reduces fee for issuance, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0474) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 474 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1224ER) |
2024-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1224H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107387D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107387D-H1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Department of Motor Vehicles |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104208D |
Same As/Similar To
SB151 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 273 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 345.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |