VA HB1246 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Officers and directors of public utilities; required disclosure. Limits the disclosure requirement for any officer or director of a public utility with an ownership value of more than five percent or $50,000 in a contractor or subcontractor hired by the utility on a construction, engineering, or equipment contract or subcontract with a value or more than $750,000 to a utility that has its rates, tolls, charges, or schedules set by the Commission based on the public utility's cost of providing service. The disclosure requirement currently applies to all utilities.
Title
Public utilities; limits disclosure requirement for any officer or director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 1-N) (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 581 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1246ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-08 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (17-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103909D |