VA HB1246 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1246
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-21 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary schools; students; digital tools; accessibility. Requires the Department of Education to convene a work group to provide input and recommendations to the Department of Education, the Board of Education, and the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2022, regarding (i) ways in which school divisions can effectively identify and receive responsive and responsible bids from vendors to procure digital tools, including online platforms, courses, digital applications, information and communication technology services, and digital content, that comply with the federal accessibility standard and (ii) any statutory or regulatory changes that may assist school divisions to procure such digital tools that comply with such standard. Public elementary and secondary schools; students; digital tools; accessibility. Requires the Department of Education to convene a work group to provide input and recommendations to the Department of Education, the Board of Education, and the General Assembly no later than November 1, 2022, regarding (i) ways in which school divisions can effectively identify and receive responsive and responsible bids from vendors to procure digital tools, including online platforms, courses, digital applications, information and communication technology services, and digital content, that comply with the federal accessibility standard and (ii) any statutory or regulatory changes that may assist school divisions to procure such digital tools that comply with such standard.
Title
School divisions, local; work group to recommend ways to procure accessible digital tools.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1246H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22105870D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 22105870D-H1 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation |
2022-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 22104448D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1246 (Carry Over) 2022-03-02 - Continued to 2023 in Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)