VA HB1273 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-04 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Historic Resources; Advisory Commission to Protect Cemeteries and Gravesites of Our Fellow Virginians Held in Bondage As Slaves; report. Provides for the Department of Historic Resources to administer a program to provide funds to memorial associations created for the caring of graves of Virginians held as slaves at the time of their deaths or cemeteries containing such graves. The bill also establishes a temporary Advisory Commission to Protect Cemeteries and Gravesites of Our Fellow Virginians Held in Bondage As Slaves to develop a list of memorial associations that are responsible or have taken responsibility for the care of the graves of Virginians held as slaves at the time of their deaths or cemeteries containing such graves.
Title
Cemeteries & Gravesites of Virginians Held in Bondage, Advisory Commission to Protect; established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-02-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14104964D |
2014-02-10 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2211.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2211.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1273 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1273+hil |