VA HB1273 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Alternative Energy and Coastal Protection Act. Directs the State Air Pollution Control Board to adopt regulations establishing a carbon dioxide cap and trade program to reduce emissions released by electric generation facilities. The regulations are required to comply with the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative model rule. The measure authorizes the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality to establish, implement, and manage an auction program to sell allowances into a market-based trading program. The measure requires revenues from the sale of carbon allowances, to the extent permitted by Article X, Section 7 of the Constitution of Virginia, to be deposited in an interest-bearing account and to be distributed without further appropriation (i) to the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund, (ii) to the VirginiaSAVES program, (iii) for certain programs in Southwest Virginia, and (iv) for administrative expenses.
Title
Va. Alternative Energy & Coastal Protection Act; regulations to establish carbon dioxide cap, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103834D |