VA HB1303 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribing controlled substances; veterinarian-client-patient relationship. Provides that a veterinarian shall not prescribe medication unless a bona fide veterinarian-client-patient relationship exists and establishes the requirements for a bona fide veterinarian-client-patient relationship.
Title
Prescribing controlled substances; veterinarian-client-patient relationship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1303ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1303H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105289D-H1 |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105289D-H1 |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18102425D |