VA HB1329 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Out-of-state concealed handgun permits; photo identification. Removes certain requirements for an out-of-state concealed handgun permit or license to be recognized and accepted in Virginia and instead requires an out-of-state permit or license holder to carry a government-issued photo identification and present such identification upon demand by a law-enforcement officer in order for his out-of-state permit or license to be recognized and accepted in Virginia.
Title
Out-of-state concealed handgun permits; photo identification.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] |
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 85-N) (Y: 0 N: 87 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 85-N) (Y: 0 N: 87 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (29-Y 9-N) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2015-02-27 | House | No further action taken |
2015-02-18 | House | Delegates: Ware, Gilbert, Keam |
2015-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Garrett, Stuart, Edwards |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-18 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE:REJECTED (0-Y 85-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 85-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (29-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (10-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (65-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (15-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-11-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2014-11-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101138D |