VA HB1329 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1329
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; local ordinances; penalties. Directs localities in Tidewater Virginia to incorporate certain penalties into their ordinances protecting the quality of state waters in Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas.
Title
Chesapeake Bay Preservation Areas; local governments to designate Areas, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1329H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106882D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106882D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104205D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Continued to 2021 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)