VA HB1339 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; retired teachers returning to work. Removes the requirement that in order for a retired teacher to return to work and continue receiving retirement payments, the teacher must be returning to a position of which there is a critical shortage. The bill has a sunset date of July 1, 2013.
Title
Retirement System; retired teachers returning to work.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2010-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-01-22 | House: Presented and ordered printed 10103999D | |
2010-01-22 | House: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB1339 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB1339+hil |