VA HB1374 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil action for trafficking in persons; charge or conviction not required. Provides that a person may maintain a civil action against an individual for trafficking in persons whether or not an individual has been charged with or convicted of certain alleged violations.
Title
Civil action for trafficking in persons; charge or conviction not required.
Sponsors
Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0385) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 385 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1374ER) |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-10-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-10-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100170D |