VA HB1380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Absentee voting; electronic signatures prohibited on Absentee voting; electronic signatures prohibited on certain applications for absentee ballots. Provides that an application for an absentee ballot that requests that the ballot be sent to an address in the United States must be signed in
Title
Absentee voting; electronic signatures prohibited on certain applications for absentee ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-12 | House | Continued to 2017 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaigns |
2016-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-01-22 | House | Presented and ordered printed 16104212D |