VA HB1392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Judges; eligibility to serve. Provides that no person who would be subject to mandatory retirement under the provisions of the Judicial Retirement System shall be eligible to serve as a judge, justice, or substitute judge.
Title
Judges; eligibility to serve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 18104422D |