VA HB141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credit. Provides that only those nonprofit organizations that hold a conservation easement acquired pursuant to the Virginia Conservation Easement Act are ineligible to receive land preservation tax credits for donations of qualifying real property.
Title
Land preservation tax credit; nonprofit organizations holding a easement are ineligible to receive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0321) | |
2010-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 321 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB141ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-10 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101046D |