VA HB1430 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Status: Introduced on January 14 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Summary
Clustering of single-family dwellings; Surry County. Extends the effective date of legislation from the 2006 Session requiring Surry County to provide for the clustering of single-family dwellings and the preservation of open space developments from July 1, 2007, to July 1, 2009. This bill is identical to
Title
Single-family dwellings; extends effective date requiring Surry County to provide for clustering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-01-14 | House: Presented and ordered printed 088760428 |
Same As/Similar To
SB671 (Same As) 2010-02-16 - Senate: Left in Finance
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1430 |