VA HB1444 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Admission to a training center. Eliminates the option for voluntary admission to a training center upon request of a person with mental retardation. This bill provides that a person may be admitted to a training center only upon written certification of eligibility for admission to a training center entered by a judge or special justice, upon petition of the parent or guardian of a person with mental retardation or other responsible person.
Title
Voluntary admission; eliminates option therefor to training center upon request of person, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-12 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-11-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-11-15 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100054D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 836 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |