VA HB1444 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of medications by employees or contract service providers of providers licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. Provides that employees of or persons providing services pursuant to a contract with a provider licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services may administer insulin, glucagon, and epinephrine pursuant to a written order issued by a prescriber in certain circumstances. The bill provides protection from liability for certain acts related to such administration and requires the Board of Nursing to promulgate regulations governing training in the administration of epinephrine and glucagon by persons authorized to administer epinephrine and glucagon.
Title
Medications; administration by certain employees or contract service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1444ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 13100634D-E |
2013-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1444E |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2012-12-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2012-12-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100634D |
Subjects
Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, Department of
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Professions and Occupations
Civil Remedies and Procedure
Health
Narcotics and Drugs
Professions and Occupations