VA HB1444 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $10.00 per hour effective July 1, 2017, to $12.50 per hour effective July 1, 2019, and to $15.00 per hour effective July 1, 2021, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act.
Title
Minimum wage; increases minimum wage from its current federally mandated level.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-11-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100286D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1444 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1444+hil |