VA HB148 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certified pollution control equipment; certification Certified pollution control equipment; certification by subdivisions. Provides that for pollution control equipment to be used as part of a political subdivision's water, wastewater, stormwater, or solid waste management facilities or systems, such equipment may be certified by the political subdivision itself instead of by the state certifying authority. This bill is identical to SB 684.
Title
Certified pollution control equipment; certification by subdivisions.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Runion [R] | Del. John Avoli [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Bill Wiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2022-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2022 | |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB148ER) |
2022-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101273D |
Same As/Similar To
SB684 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
SB684 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
SB684 (Same As) 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)