VA HB150 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Management of menhaden. Requires the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations to implement the Interstate Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden and authorizes the Commission to adopt regulations for managing the Commonwealth's menhaden fishery. The bill also requires that any moratorium on the fishery be subject to legislative review. Several sections dealing with quotas, allocation of allowable landings, and administrative procedures are repealed and will be included in a regulatory framework for managing the fishery.
Title
Menhaden fishery; VMRC to adopt regulations to implement Interstate Fishery Management Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2015-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101165D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB150 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB150+hil |