VA HB1515 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic lights; enforcement. Provides that, in addition to observing the violation directly, a law-enforcement officer may detain or arrest the driver of a motor vehicle violating a traffic light signal if the officer observes the violation through the use of a red light activation terminal approved by the Virginia State Police Superintendent.
Title
Traffic lights; use of a red light activation terminal approved by State Police Superintendent.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11100567D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1515E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2010-12-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-12-17 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100567D |