VA HB1515 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Circuit court clerks; electronic transfer of certain documents. Permits circuit court clerks to transfer electronically, or provide electronic access to, documents related to certain real property information to certain public officials.
Title
Circuit court clerks; electronic transfer of certain documents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 42 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 20, 2017 | |
2017-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/13/17 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1515ER) |
2017-02-10 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 17101620D-E |
2017-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1515E |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101620D |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Courts
Computer Services and Uses
Courts of Record
Electronic Processes
Taxation
Wills Trusts and Fiduciaries
Clerks of Courts
Computer Services and Uses
Courts of Record
Electronic Processes
Taxation
Wills Trusts and Fiduciaries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3360.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
64 | 2 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |