VA HB1523 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603)
Summary
Electric utility planning. Requires electric utilities to submit, by September 1, 2009, an integrated resource plan (IRP) that provides a forecast of its load obligations and a plan to meet those obligations by supply side and demand side resources over the ensuing 15 years to provide reasonable prices, reliable service, energy independence, and environmental responsibility. Updated IRPs will be filed every two years thereafter. The 2009 IRPs shall include an assessment of programs to assist low income residential consumers.
Title
Electric utilities; resource planning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0603) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 603 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-04 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1523ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1523H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080191672-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Committee substitute printed 080191672-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned C & L sub: 3 Energy | |
2008-01-18 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-18 | House: Presented and ordered printed 084793588 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB1523 |