VA HB1535 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commercial motor vehicles; driving in left-most lane. Limits the locations where a person may drive a commercial motor vehicle in the left-most lane from those interstate highways having more than two lanes in each direction with a posted speed limit of less than 65 miles per hour to those interstate highways having more than two lanes in each direction with a posted speed limit of less than 55 miles per hour.
Title
Commercial motor vehicles; limits driving in left-most lane.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101150D |