VA HB1545 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-20 - Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Special conservators of the peace; use of word police on badge. Provides that a court, upon request and for good cause shown, may authorize a special conservator of the peace who meets all requirements for law-enforcement officers and is employed by the Roanoke College Office of Campus Safety or the Dinwiddie Airport and Industrial Authority to use the word "police" on any badge, uniform, or vehicle in the performance of his duties or the seal of the Commonwealth on any badge or credential in the performance of his duties. Special conservators of the peace; use of word police on badge. Provides that a court, upon request and for good cause shown, may authorize a special conservator of the peace who meets all requirements for law-enforcement officers and is employed by the Roanoke College Office of Campus Safety or the Dinwiddie Airport and Industrial Authority to use the word "police" on any badge, uniform, or vehicle in the performance of his duties or the seal of the Commonwealth on any badge or credential in the performance of his duties.
Title
Special conservators of the peace; airport commission or authority.
Sponsors
Del. Kim Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Judiciary (10-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-30 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 23104591D-EH1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1545EH1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Amendment by Delegate McNamara agreed to |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104591D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104591D-H1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100307D |
Subjects
Authorities
Aviation
Conservators of the Peace
Criminal Procedure
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Aviation
Conservators of the Peace
Criminal Procedure
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions