VA HB178 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility of seasonal or temporary workers for unemployment benefits. Disqualifies an unemployed individual for unemployment compensation benefits if he was provided with written notice, and signed an acknowledgment of receipt of such notice, by his employer stating that his employment is temporary or seasonal and will be terminated by a date certain or upon the completion of seasonal work specified in the written notice.
Title
Seasonal or temporary workers; disqualifies employee from unemployment compensation benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #1 | |
2010-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101722D |