VA HB178 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Continuing care facilities; residents meetings. Requires that the issues discussed at meetings between the governing body of a continuing care facility and the residents of the facility or their representatives include income, expenditures, and financial matters as they apply to the facility and proposed changes in policies, programs, facilities, and services. Currently, these issues may be, but are not required to be, discussed at such meetings.
Title
Continuing care facilities; resident's meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2012-01-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-09 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103408D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB178 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB178+hil |