VA HB178 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; assumed rate of return on investments. Provides that if the General Assembly adopts an assumed rate of return on investments that is different from the rate used by the Board of the Virginia Retirement System (VRS) in determining employer contribution rates for contributions to VRS, the Board shall recalculate the employer contribution rate for each employer to incorporate the assumed rate of return adopted by the General Assembly. The Board is required to provide each employer with its adjusted employer contribution rate as soon as possible.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; assumed rate of return on investments for employer contributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement |
2013-12-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-12-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100797D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB178 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB178+hil |