VA HB1917 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain contracts between governmental agencies prohibited. Requires any governmental agency that intends to purchase services for an amount over $25,000 from another governmental agency, which service is found on the commercial activities list, to post notice of such purchase and provide the opportunity for comment by or the submission of information from the private sector on each such intended purchase. The provisions of the bill do not apply to (i) mandatory purchases pursuant to § 53.1-47, (ii) contracts specifically exempted pursuant to Article 3 (§ 2.2-4343 et seq.) of the Virginia Public Procurement Act, (iii) services provided by central service state agencies, (iv) activities operated as an internal service fund of the Commonwealth, or (v) purchases from public institutions of higher education. The bill specifies where the notice is to be posted and defines commercial activities list and governmental agency.
Title
Governmental agencies; contracts for items listed on commercial activities list.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1917ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 4-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1917ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1917H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104248D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104248D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103309D |