VA HB210 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Pretrial appeal by the Commonwealth. Allows an attorney for the Commonwealth to take a pretrial appeal on the constitutionality of an evidentiary ruling by a juvenile and domestic relations district court in a case in which a juvenile under the age of 14 is to be tried for an offense that would be a violent juvenile felony if committed by a juvenile 14 years of age or older. The bill provides that such appeal shall be heard by the circuit court. If the juvenile and domestic relations district court's ruling is affirmed, the attorney for the Commonwealth may appeal the circuit court's decision to the Court of Appeals, and such decision shall be final. If the circuit court finds that the juvenile and domestic relations court erred, the circuit court shall remand the case for trial consistent with the circuit court's ruling.
Title
Juvenile and domestic relations district; pretrial appeals by the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-09 | House | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2018-02-09 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105168D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 7-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102869D |