VA HB23 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited discrimination in public employment and housing; sexual orientation or gender identity. Prohibits discrimination in public employment on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill also codifies for state and local government employment the current prohibitions on discrimination in employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a veteran. Additionally, the bill adds discrimination on the basis of an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity as an unlawful housing practice. The bill defines "sexual orientation" and "gender identity."
Title
Public employment and housing; prohibited discrimination, sexual orientation or gender identity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1663-Sickles) by voice vote |
2020-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100480D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1663 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in House
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
55 | 1 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB23 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB23+hil |