VA HB237 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telework Grant Program. Establishes the Telework Grant Program, to be administered by the Department of Rail and Public Transportation, to administer grants in the amount of $250 for individuals who telework at least 20 hours per week for at least 45 weeks of a calendar year.
Title
Telework Grant Program; Program to be administered by Department of Rail and Public Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2013-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100910D |