VA HB282 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Moving violations; highway work zones. Creates a traffic infraction for any moving violation in a highway work zone punishable by a fine of not less than $300 for the first offense and not less than $500 for any subsequent offense. The bill provides that for any subsequent offense that occurs within the same 12-month period as another such offense such fine shall be not less than $750.
Title
Highway work zones; creates a traffic infraction for any moving violation in a work zone.
Sponsors
Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Laura Jane Cohen [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB282ER) |
2024-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Highway Safety and Policy |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103499D |