VA HB284 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; air carrier licenses; privileges. Provides that for purposes of supplying its airplanes, as well as any airplanes of a licensed express carrier flying under the same brand, an air carrier licensee may appoint an authorized representative to transport and store wine and beer at or in close proximity to the airport where the wine and beer will be delivered onto the airplanes of the air carrier and any such licensed express carrier. The bill provides that the air carrier licensee shall (i) designate for purposes of its license all locations where the inventory of wine and beer may be stored and from which the wine and beer will be delivered onto airplanes of the air carrier and any such licensed express carrier and (ii) maintain records of all wine and beer to be transported, stored, and delivered by its authorized representative. The bill includes the same requirements for mixed beverages air carrier licensees for distilled spirits.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; air carrier licensees, privileges.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0125) | |
2014-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 125 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB284ER) |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB284H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104340D-H1 |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104340D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102792D |