VA HB334 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; proceeding for enforcement. Provides that in an enforcement action, if the court finds the public body violated certain meeting notice requirements, the court may invalidate any action of the public body taken at such meeting.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; proceeding for enforcement.
Sponsors
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101035D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB334 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB334+hil |