VA HB334 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional teacher licensure; grace period. Allows an individual who seeks a provisional teacher license to satisfy certain licensure requirements, such as demonstrating proficiency in the use of educational technology for instruction and completing study in child abuse recognition and intervention, during the first year of provisional licensure. Current law requires that such licensure requirements be met prior to the granting of a provisional teacher license.
Title
Teachers; provisional licensure, grace period.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2018-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103306D |