VA HB338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (12-Y 3-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid; work requirement; report. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services (the Department) to apply for a waiver to implement a work requirement for able-bodied adult recipients of medical assistance services. The bill requires the Department to administer the Training, Education, Employment, and Opportunity Program (the Program) to enable Medicaid enrollees to improve their health and well-being through training, education, employment and other community engagement opportunities leading to self-sufficiency. The bill requires Medicaid recipients to participate in the program but provides exceptions for children, individuals age 65 or older, individuals with certain disabilities, and individuals who are the primary caregiver for a dependent.
Title
Medicaid; Training, Education, Employment, and Opportunity Program for able-bodied adult recipients.
Sponsors
Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Chris Jones [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Hyland Fowler [R] |
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Robert Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 36-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 36-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB338H2 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 18107013D-H2 |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee substitute from Rules rejected 18106104D-H1 |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Committee substitute printed 18107013D-H2 |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106104D-H1 |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102781D |