VA HB342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control (ABC); privatization of ABC stores. Provides for the issuance of a "package store" license to authorize the retail sale of alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption. The bill also requires the ABC Board to sell at auction all real estate used as ABC stores, and to terminate leased property upon which the ABC Board has operated a government store. The bill requires the ABC Board to complete an implementation study by December 31, 2010, on how it will privatize government stores. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2011, to achieve full retail privatization of government stores. The bill provides that any monetary savings realized by the ABC Board from the implementation of the bill shall be applied to the Transportation Trust Fund. The bill contains numerous technical amendments.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; privatization of ABC stores.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/10 10100600D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 119.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 120.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 204.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 214.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB342 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB342+hil |