VA HB342 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Designation of a person authorized to kill deer or bear damaging property. Permits a landowner or lessee whose property may be damaged by deer or bear to request that another person or persons be designated to kill such animals upon any written authorization to kill deer or bear that may be granted. The legislation instructs the Director of the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries to establish a website where a landowner may register property and establish hunting conditions and where a person may apply on a first-come, first-served basis to be designated on a written authorization to kill deer or bear damaging the property. The Director is required to pay the landowner at least half of the fee charged to the designated person.
Title
Deer or bear; person whose property may be damaged are authorized to kill.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-02-08 | House | Continued to 2013 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2012-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2012-01-18 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources |
2012-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2012-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102365D |