VA HB343 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Continued to 2025 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Continued to 2025 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Financial institutions; regulation of money transmitters; penalty. Replaces existing state law regulating money transmitters with comprehensive provisions aimed at standardizing the regulation of money transmitters across the 50 states. The bill includes provisions for the licensure of money transmitters, supervision and implementation by the State Corporation Commission, acquisition of control of a licensee, mandatory disclosures, reporting and records requirements, authorized delegates, mandatory disclosures, prudential standards, and enforcement.
Title
Financial institutions; regulation of money transmitters, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Continued to 2025 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2024-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101753D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 2 | 1900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1918 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1921 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1922 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 2 | 1956 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |